This Search uses AND operators, it only returns documents with ALL the keywords you entered/selected.
Jesús Leaños C. was the brother of our colleague Bertha Leaños Peredo.
María Elena trabajó en la Secretaría General de la OEA de Asistente del Programa de Bibliotecas para América Latina y el Caribe, Departamento de Asuntos Culturales.
Mr. Zúñiga was a Staff Member of the General Secretariat from 1961 to 1988. He served in the Department of Educational Affairs as Chief of the Division of Experimentation, Education for Work, and Special Projects.
Mr. Sorvill worked in the General Secretariat of the OAS for several years, and lately for the Panamerican Health Organization.
Mr. Stoker was a staff member of the General Secretariat of the OAS from July 15, 1963 to June 30, 1999.
He worked in the Department of Human Resources.
Mr. Fighetti was a staff member of the General Secretariat from 1965 to 1982.
He worked in the area of Education, Science & Culture.
Mr. Velloso was a staff member of the General Secretariat from August 11, 1958 to March 14, 1980.
He worked in the Department of Public Information.
Mr. Ribeiro was a staff member of the General Secretariat from June 1, 1951 to March 31, 1994. He worked at
the Inter-American Juridical Committee.
Miguel Harry fue Jefe de Prensa en el Departamento de Información Pública de la OEA y en varias oportunidades Director Interino y/o Encargado del Departamento de Información Publica.