This Search uses AND operators, it only returns documents with ALL the keywords you entered/selected.
Hermana de Rosa Maria Lewis
He worked for the Organization of American States from 1970 to 1989 (early retirement) in the Department of Material Resources.
Prestó servicios a la OEA desde febrero 19, 1951 hasta el 30 de junio 1976.
Trabajó en el Departamento de Información Pública.
Fue funcionario en el Departamento de Asuntos Educativos de la Secretaría General desde el primero de marzo de 1963 al 31 de octubre de 1973.
Mr. Salem was Chief of Staff under Secretary General Alejandro Orfila, Director of the Department of Personnel, and Director of the OAS Office in Uruguay.
In 1983, he was awarded the Leo S. Rowe Award in recognition of his humanitarianism and valor in securing the release of the hostages being held at the OAS Office in El Salvador.
Beryl joined the General Secretariat on September 10, 1951, and retired on December 31, 1982.
He worked in the Department of Social Affairs and was a former President and founding member of AROAS.
Osvaldo worked for the Organization from June 1962 to March 1989. Osvaldo’s early career with the Organization was with the Inter-American Urban and Regional Planning Program (PIAPUR) in Lima and the Inter-American Housing Center (CINVA) in Bogotá. At headquarters, his career was a varied one that included serving as Deputy Director of the then Department of Urban and Rural Integration and Chief of the Division of Social Affairs.
Husband of Joan Hetzel Irañeta, a long-time OAS staff member.
Pedro was himself a former staff member of the Organization, working for the Economics Division between
1948 and 1952, where he became chief from 1959 to 1960.
Dolores worked at the Inter-American Defense Board for two different periods: from 1945 to 1951 and then from 1959 to 1978. For a number of years and up to the time of her retirement, Dolores was Executive Secretary of the
Board’s Conferences and Documents office.