This Search uses AND operators, it only returns documents with ALL the keywords you entered/selected.
Office of Planning
Worked April 9, 1969 - May 25, 1972.
Dyala was the wife of our colleague Gonzalo Saenz Zuazo
Department of Educational Affairs and Americas Magazine. An expert in education, Estellita was president
of the Inter-American Fellowship Committee. After many years of service, she finally retired
from the Organization in 1974.
The Office of Coordination of Activities Away from Headquarters
Worked Jan 1958 - Dec 1983
Office of Retirement and Pension Fund
Worked 11/22/1965 - 10/8/1992
Office of Conferences
OAS Start date: 07/01/1952
Department of Social Affairs and the Inter-American Commission on Human Rights
Department of Material Resources
OAS Start date: 08/01/1964
Department of Social Affairs
OAS Start date: 01/01/1948
OAS Unit of Language Services 1973-1989